Gemmill, Margaret (CPSO#: 93065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Department of Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9300 Ext. 73935
Fax: (613) 549-5403
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Gemmill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gemmill ( CPSO# 93065 )

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET GEMMILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEMMILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012