Ghadai, Talha Ismaeel (CPSO#: 85821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Urdu

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Town Centre Court
Unit 3
Scarborough ON  M1P 0B1
Phone: 416-792-2654
Fax: 416-792-4786
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

186 Thornton Road South
Oshawa ON  L1J 5Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-5181
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
2nd Floor, D-Wing
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4579
Fax: (905) 721-7763
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Talha Ghadai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ghadai ( CPSO# 85821 )

Business Address:
3 - 60 Town Centre Court
Scarborough ON  M1P 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 792-2654

Business Address:
186 Thornton Road South
Oshawa ON  L1J 5Y2
Phone Number: (905) 576-5181

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TALHA ISMAEEL GHADAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009