Ghanekar, Anand (CPSO#: 72310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
11 PMB 171
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4606
Fax: (416) 340-4767
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anand Ghanekar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sarjeant ( CPSO# 72562 )
Dr. A. Ghanekar ( CPSO# 72310 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Clinical Services Building
11 PMB 171
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4606

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANAND GHANEKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHANEKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2006