Ghatavi, Kayhan Reza (CPSO#: 71668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Hospital
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5028
Fax: (705) 876-5013
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harvie Ghatavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. K. Ghatavi ( CPSO# 71668 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Department of Psychiatry
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAYHAN REZA GHATAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHATAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2007