Ghiasi, Nazli (CPSO#: 93143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
333 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone: (905) 274-9999
Fax: (905) 274-9991
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
Dermatology Centre
8 East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5952
Fax: (416) 603-2782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nazli Ghiasi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ghiasi ( CPSO# 93143 )

Business Address:
8 East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
Suite 102
333 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone Number: (905) 274-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAZLI GHIASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHIASI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015