Gholizadeh-Ahangari, Shirin (CPSO#: 90908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Kashan Univ. of Medical Sc & Health Serv, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone: (905) 597-2528
Fax: (905) 597-2536
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

103 Parkway Forest Drive
Willowdale ON  M2J 1L8
Canada
Phone: (416) 491-7451
Fax: (416) 491-8008
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gholizadeh-Ahangari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gholizadeh-Ahangari ( CPSO# 90908 )

Business Address:
103 Parkway Forest Drive
Suite 56
North York ON  M2J 1L8

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRIN GHOLIZADEH-AHANGARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOLIZADEH-AHANGARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012