Gibson, Michelle Catherine (CPSO#: 73675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 53256
Fax: (613) 544-4017
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: 6135483232
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St.
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: 613-544-3400
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.C. Gibson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gibson ( CPSO# 73675 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE CATHERINE GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2002