Gill, Harmander Singh (CPSO#: 88802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The 6ix Medical Clinics
550 Front Street West
Unit 57
Toronto ON  M5V 3N5
Phone: (647) 695-3199
Fax: (647) 695-3699
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The 6ix Medical Clinics
550 Front Street West
Unit 57
Toronto ON  M5V 3N5
Canada
Phone: (647) 695-3199
Fax: (647) 695-3699
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

GoreQueen Medical Centre
8730 The Gore Road
Brampton ON  L6P 0B1
Canada
Phone: (647) 695-3199
Fax: (647) 695-3699
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARMANDER SINGH GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2011

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Gill’s professional misconduct and incompetence have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Gill failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or is incompetent in his care of patients. It is also alleged that Dr. Gill engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including by engaging in inappropriate billing practices and providing untruthful or inaccurate information during the College’s investigation.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): November 26-30, December 10-14, 2018 and January 7, 2019