Glass, David Hughes (CPSO#: 55731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East Owen Sound ON
N4K6M9
Owen Sound ON  N4K6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2345
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Glass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Glass ( CPSO# 55731 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
229 Nelson Street West
Meaford ON  N4L 1A3
Phone Number: (519) 538-1311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 7, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David H. Glass, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Glass to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. DAVID HUGHES GLASS
                                          ("Dr. Glass")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Glass, certificate of registration number 55731, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Glass, acknowledge that I currently practice or have privileges
                  only at Grey Bruce Health Services and South Bruce Grey Health Centre
                  (collectively, my "Practice Locations"). 

            (4)   I, Dr. Glass, acknowledge that I do not practice or have privileges at
                  any location, including but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics and
                  offices, in any jurisdiction, other than my Practice Locations. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Glass, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Glass, undertake that I shall not engage in the practice of
                        medicine as the Most Responsible Physician for any patient(s)
                        whatsoever.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Glass, undertake that the entirety of my scope of practice
                        will be limited in the following ways:
                  
                        (i)   I shall only practise medicine as a surgical assistant of a
                              surgeon:
                  
                              a.    certified by the Royal College of Physicians and
                                    Surgeons or recognized as a surgical specialist by the
                                    College; and
                  
                              b.    who holds privileges at one of my Practice Locations,
                                    or other location as may be approved by the College,
                  
                              (collectively, a "Qualified Surgeon"); and
                  
                        (ii)  for further clarity, but without limiting the generality of
                              section (6)(b)(i) above:
                  
                              a.    I will not provide any pre-operative or post-operative
                                    care whatsoever; and
                  
                              b.    a Qualified Surgeon must always be physically in
                                    attendance when I am engaging in my practice as a
                                    surgical assistant.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Glass, undertake that I will not engage in any practice of
                        medicine that is not expressly and specifically listed in section
                        (6)(b) above.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Glass, undertake that I will not commence surgical assisting
                        at any other location (other than my Practice Locations) without
                        prior approval of the College. Should I seek privileges to perform
                        surgical assisting at any other location, I shall advise the
                        College within five (5) days of making such application, and shall
                        seek approval to practice surgical assisting at the location at
                        least fourteen (14) days before I plan to commence surgical
                        assisting at that location. 
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Glass, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations by a College
                  representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the
                  provisions of this Undertaking.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Glass, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Glass, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Glass, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Glass, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Glass, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Glass, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Glass, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Glass, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Issues were identified with respect to Dr. Glass's standard
                              of practice. As a result, Dr. Glass will only practise as a
                              surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified
                              surgeon. Further, Dr. Glass shall practice only at Grey Bruce
                              Health Services and South Bruce Grey Health Centre.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Glass, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Glass, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "A".

            (17)  I, Dr. Glass, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Qualified Surgeon(s) and Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising
                  from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Glass, give my irrevocable consent to any Qualified Surgeon and
                  any Chief of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, all
                  information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes
                  of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.   

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Hughes Glass to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 7, 2018:

Issues were identified with respect to Dr. Glass’s standard of practice. As a result, Dr. Glass will only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Glass shall practice only at Grey Bruce Health Services and South Bruce Grey Health Centre.