Gnanapandithen, Kumudini (CPSO#: 79414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7601
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Gnanapandithen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gnanapandithen ( CPSO# 79414 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7601

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUMUDINI GNANAPANDITHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GNANAPANDITHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2008