Gojer, Julian Abel Constantine (CPSO#: 65873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone: (416) 323-9939
Fax: (416) 323-3166
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1804 Highway 2 E
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Canada
Phone: 613 341 2870
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julian Gojer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gojer ( CPSO# 65873 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone Number: (416) 323-9939

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIAN ABEL CONSTANTINE GOJER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOJER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1992