Goldberg, Cory Scot (CPSO#: 73687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 401
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 907-5810
Fax: (647) 477-6284
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2701 Rutherford Road, Unit A
Vaughan ON  L4K 2N6
Canada
Phone: (905) 417-1683
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cory S. Goldberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Goldberg ( CPSO# 73687 )

Business Address:
Queensway Professional Centre
Suite 401
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 907-5810

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORY SCOT GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006