Golden, Alanna Jennifer (CPSO#: 95528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 4169462000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R3J3
Canada
Phone: 416-654-5437
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Apr 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALANNA JENNIFER GOLDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015