Goldstein, Sol Julian (CPSO#: 21457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1968

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:Dalhousie University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
254 Viewmount Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 1V2
Phone: (416) 929-3287
Fax: (416) 929-5832
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3455 Crescent Harbour Road
Stroud ON  L9S 2Y7
Canada
Phone: (705) 436-2434
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

10 Strawberry Lane
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 368-1896
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sol Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goldstein ( CPSO# 21457 )

Business Address:
254 Viewmount Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 1V2
Phone Number: (416) 929-3287

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOL JULIAN GOLDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1968

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Goldstein’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Goldstein failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients and that he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, including in his recordkeeping and billing practices.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): June 3-7 and June 17-19, 2019

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)