Golger, Alexander (CPSO#: 79342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1802 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5M 3Z1
Phone: (416) 789-9979
Fax: (888) 463-3095
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Golger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Golger ( CPSO# 79342 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 3G3
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
300 - 1131A Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8
Phone Number: (416) 527-2263

Business Address:
305 - 419 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 7J2
Phone Number: (905) 743-9888

Business Address:
1802 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5M 3Z1
Phone Number: (416) 789-9979

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER GOLGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008