Gomperts, Natalie Rosanne (CPSO#: 77782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9600 Bathurst Street, Suite 305
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: (416) 588-3788
Fax: (416) 588-5633
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

108-2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2Z9
Canada
Phone: 416-667-9598
Fax: 416-667-9525
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

16700 Bayview Ave
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Canada
Phone: (289) 803-2959
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie R Gomperts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gomperts ( CPSO# 77782 )

Business Address:
2100 Finch Avenue West
Suite 108
Toronto ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 667-9598

Business Address:
9600 Bathurst Street
Suite 305
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone Number: (416) 588-3788

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (289) 803-2959

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE ROSANNE GOMPERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMPERTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006