Gordon, Alexis Charlotte (CPSO#: 100771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 St Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexis Gordon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gordon ( CPSO# 100771)

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXIS CHARLOTTE GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 10 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018