Goswami, Rupashi (CPSO#: 90058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Ross University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 HIGHWAY 20 EAST
UNIT A6
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Phone: (905) 892-1010
Fax: (905) 892-4004
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Goswami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goswami ( CPSO# 90058 )

Business Address:
A6 - 130 Hwy 20 East
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Phone Number: (905) 892-1010

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUPASHI GOSWAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSWAMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2008 to 23 Feb 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2011