Gow, Alexandrea Kathryn (CPSO#: 95089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington & Area
Family Health Team
Suite 101
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Phone: (519) 322-1100
Fax: (519) 322-2055
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Leamington District Memorial Hosp.
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Sun Parlor Home
175 Talbot Street East
Leamington ON  N8H 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-5731
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandrea Gow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gow ( CPSO# 95089 )

Business Address:
Leamington & Area
Family Health Team
Suite 101
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Phone Number: (519) 322-1100

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 332-2501

Business Address:
175 Talbot Street East
Leamington ON  N8H 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 326-5731

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDREA KATHRYN GOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013