Gowan, Amy Jeanne (CPSO#: 83017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Jongerius, Amy Jeanne (used until: 15 Aug 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grey Bruce Health Services
Southampton Hospital
340 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 797-3230
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Gowan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gowan ( CPSO# 83017 )

Business Address:
Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-9940

Business Address:
140 Grey Street South
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-3220

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
340 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-3230

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY JEANNE GOWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007