Graff, Kelly Jeannette (CPSO#: 110042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kelly Graff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Graff ( CPSO# 110042)

Business Address:
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY JEANNETTE GRAFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2018