Graham, Lindsay Alexander (CPSO#: 27233)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 20-Jul-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lindsay Graham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 257 Belford Cres Ottawa ON K1Z 7A9
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018