Gratzer, David George (CPSO#: 75146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
250 College St.
Office 1133, 11th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 30412
Fax: 416-979-6815
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Gratzer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wein ( CPSO# 75050 )
Dr. D. Gratzer ( CPSO# 75146 )

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GEORGE GRATZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRATZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005