Graver, Alison Marie (CPSO#: 82545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
308- 770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 725-9374
Fax: (613) 725-9195
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison Graver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Graver ( CPSO# 82545 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
308 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 725-9374

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 05 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON MARIE GRAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010