Green, Jeremy Allan (CPSO#: 76915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B1
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 624-8820
Fax: (888) 389-9273
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy A. Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Green ( CPSO# 76915 )

Business Address:
Unit B1
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 624-8820

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY ALLAN GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003