Greenspoon, Todd Theodore (CPSO#: 93261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite M1
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone: (905) 529-5221
Fax: (905) 546-0361
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Todd Greenspoon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Greenspoon ( CPSO# 93261 )

Business Address:
Suite M1
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 529-5221

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD THEODORE GREENSPOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENSPOON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012