Gregory, Kathleen Margaret (CPSO#: 96078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: Gregory-Miller, Kathleen Margaret (used until: 06 Dec 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6th Floor Kaufman Building
Grand River Hospital
835 King St. West
P.O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G1G3
Phone: 519 749 4348
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gregory ( CPSO# 96078 )
Dr. M. Miller ( CPSO# 88830 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
6th Floor
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Business Address:
St Josephs Hospital
Room M337
Marian Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Corporation Name: Kathleen Gregory-Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gregory ( CPSO# 96078 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (905) 518-2501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN MARGARET GREGORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGORY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2015