Grewal, Manavdeep Singh (CPSO#: 84281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 505
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 458-0177
Fax: (905) 458-0178
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.S. Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Grewal ( CPSO# 53600 )
Dr. M. Grewal ( CPSO# 84281 )

Business Address:
Suite 505
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 458-0177

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANAVDEEP SINGH GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008