Grewal, Seena Sukhpreet Kaur (CPSO#: 76496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General - Branson
555 Finch Avenue West
5th floor
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 635-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seena Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Grewal ( CPSO# 76496 )

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 635-2400

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7456

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEENA SUKHPREET KAUR GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006