Griesman, Jordan Alan (CPSO#: 56770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12 Morgan Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 1R1
Phone: (905) 695-5665
Fax: (905) 695-5666
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 301
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-6861
Fax: (905) 773-2161
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

83 Dawson Road, Suite 105
Guelph ON  N1H1B1
Canada
Phone: 226-314-1190
Fax: 519-763-3345
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

462 Paxon Street, Port Perry, ON
Port Perry ON  L9L1L9
Canada
Phone: 905-985-9727
Fax: 905-985-0479
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Griesman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Griesman ( CPSO# 56769 )
Dr. J. Griesman ( CPSO# 56770 )

Business Address:
301 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-6861

Business Address:
100 - 12 Morgan Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 1R1
Phone Number: (905) 695-5665

Business Address:
105 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (226) 314-1190

Business Address:
462 Paxon Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-9727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN ALAN GRIESMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIESMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987