Guller, Dmitry (CPSO#: 82729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dmitry Guller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Guller ( CPSO# 82729 )

Business Address:
Orillia Solders' Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DMITRY GULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 14 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2008 to 14 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 11 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010