Gunasekera, Shiny Dinuka (CPSO#: 76682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mood disorders Program
100 West 5th Street
PO Box 585
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33179
Fax: (905) 381-5629
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Gunasekera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gunasekera ( CPSO# 76682 )

Business Address:
100 West Fifth Street
PO Box 585
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHINY DINUKA GUNASEKERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNASEKERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2001 to 19 Oct 2001
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002