Gupta, Jagdeep Singh (CPSO#: 82857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
55 Dundas Street East, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Phone: (416) 361-6000
Fax: (416) 361-6044
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ambalavanar ( CPSO# 85074 )
Dr. J. Gupta ( CPSO# 82857 )
Dr. W. Cheema ( CPSO# 82070 )

Business Address:
Cloud Care Clinic
55 Dundas Street East
Basement Level
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Phone Number: (416) 361-6000


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gupta ( CPSO# 82857 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
55 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Phone Number: (416) 361-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAGDEEP SINGH GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2009