Gupta, Renu Bala (CPSO#: 90787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Davisville Family Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 932-3172
Fax: (416) 440-0238
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta ( CPSO# 90787 )
Dr. S. Gupta ( CPSO# 79499 )

Business Address:
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone Number: (416) 932-3172

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Room 6044 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5P 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENU BALA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011