Habaz, Yehuda (CPSO#: 89682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lindsay Women's Health Clinic
257 Lindsay St. S
Lindsay ON  K9V 4R5
Phone: (705) 320-9977
Fax: (705) 320-9359
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Disera Medical Centre
Suite 210
31 Disera Dr.
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Canada
Phone: (905) 771-7755
Fax: (905) 771-7752
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YEHUDA HABAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013