Hack, Anna Theresa (CPSO#: 93145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pinecrest Queensway
Community Health Center
1365 Richmond Road, 2nd Floor
Ottawa ON  K2B 6R7
Phone: (613) 820-2001
Fax: (613) 820-2006
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Carleton University
Health and Counselling Services
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Canada
Phone: (613) 520-6674
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

College Square Medical Centre
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Canada
Phone: (613) 224-6606
Fax: (613) 224-6162
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA THERESA HACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012