Haddad, Dimitri Elias (CPSO#: 76302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Armoury Sports Medicine Centre
245 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2J 3Z4
Phone: (226) 336-8961
Fax: (519) 513-0500
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-3611
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2333
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dimitri Haddad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Haddad ( CPSO# 76302 )

Business Address:
40 George Street North
Cambridge ON  N1S 2M8
Phone Number: (519) 622-4529

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIMITRI ELIAS HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006