Hadj Tahar, Abdallah (CPSO#: 94383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Faculte De Medecine De Monastir, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Booth Neurology
343-B Booth Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1
Phone: (613) 233-3030
Fax: (613) 233-1061
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinique Neuro-outaouais
147, Boul. d'Europe, suite 200
Gatineau QC  J9J 0A5
Canada
Phone: 1-819-777-2500
Fax: 8197772502
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDALLAH HADJ TAHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADJ TAHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011