Hafez, Mohammed Nassoh (CPSO#: 86961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Capital Cardiology
602-2 Gurdwara rd
Ottawa ON  K2E 1A2
Phone: (613) 714-9855
Fax: (613) 714-9857
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1370 Clyde Avenue, Nepean
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1370 Clyde Avenue, Nepean
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Nassoh Hafez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hafez ( CPSO# 86961 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2

Business Address:
602 - 2 Gurdwara Road
Ottawa ON  K2E 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 714-9855

Business Address:
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED NASSOH HAFEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAFEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 2009 to 01 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 2010 to 01 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 2011 to 01 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2007