Haidar, Nadim Hicham (CPSO#: 94738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone: (705) 450-5300
Fax: (705) 450-5900
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadim Haidar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Haidar ( CPSO# 94738 )

Business Address:
Suite 335
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 254-4364

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 25 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIM HICHAM HAIDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 13 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Urology

McMaster University, 14 Feb 2011 to 14 Apr 2011
Elective Trainee - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2011