Hainer, Tammy Lynne (CPSO#: 86444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: Wilson, Tammy Lynne (used until: 27 Jan 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg, ON
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Fax: (519) 842-3793
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tillsonburg District Memorial
Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg, ON
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tammy Hainer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hainer ( CPSO# 86444 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
Suite 13
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone Number: (519) 842-4231

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMMY LYNNE HAINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAINER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2010