Hajy Aghaei, Roya (CPSO#: 87642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Finch Medical Centre
Suite 202
3292 Bayview Avenue
Willowdale ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 222-9955
Fax: (416) 222-8088
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roya Hajy Aghaei Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hajy Aghaei ( CPSO# 87642 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
3292 Bayview Avenue
Willowdale ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 222-9955

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROYA HAJY AGHAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJY AGHAEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 24 Mar 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010