Halonen, Mark Allen (CPSO#: 95049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 May 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:MSU - College of Osteopathic Medicine, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
1361 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1J6
Phone: (519) 258-6002 Ext. 232
Fax: (519) 258-7896
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sandwich Community Health Centre
3320 College Ave.
Windsor ON  N9C 0E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-6002 Ext. 708
Fax: (519) 258-7896
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Oct 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Mark Allen Halonen may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.