Hamami, Hannah (CPSO#: 113527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohajer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hamami ( CPSO# 113527)
Dr. P. Mohajer ( CPSO# 101263)

Business Address:
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 3C2
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANNAH HAMAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMAMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2017 to 27 Aug 2017
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2018