Hameed, Asiya (CPSO#: 87908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Dec 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Aligarh Muslim University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Department Obstetrics & Gynaecology
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811 Ext. 4638
Fax: (905) 373-6996
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asiya Hameed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hameed ( CPSO# 87908 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Department of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
Suite 2A-11
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7796

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Dec 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Asiya Hameed may practise independently in the area of Obstetrics and
            Gynaecology only.