Hanmiah, Rajendar (CPSO#: 78798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room F533
Fontbone Building
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6146
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hanmiah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hanmiah ( CPSO# 78798 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
Room F533
Fontbone Building
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6146

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJENDAR HANMIAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANMIAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004