Hanna, Sameh (CPSO#: 90316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Mar 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone: (416) 922-9620
Fax: (416) 922-4358
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sameh Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hanna ( CPSO# 90316 )

Business Address:
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 922-9620

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5953

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 25 Mar 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Sameh Hanna may practise medicine independently in dermatology, only.