Hanna, Timothy Paul (CPSO#: 81017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern ON
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4144
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. M. Korzeniowski ( CPSO# 95051 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: Timothy Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY PAUL HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012