Hansen, Aaron Richard (CPSO#: 97229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 2015

Expiry Date:  15 Mar 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Mar 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
& Hematology
700 University Avenue, 7-623
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5606
Fax: 4169464563
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aaron R. Hansen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hansen ( CPSO# 97229 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology & Hematology
700 University Avenue
Suite 7-623
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 16 Mar 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 15 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 15 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Mar 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Aaron Richard Hansen may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Medical Oncology and Haematology, University of
                        Toronto, in which Dr. Hansen holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Hansen  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Hansen's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Hansen's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on March 16, 2015. In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on March 15, 2022.