Hanson, Miriam Louise (CPSO#: 90035)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Baylor College of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Mamelak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 14 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 29 Nov 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 May 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015